Ms. Marianne Stowell Bracke
(Chair, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Mary Linn Bergstrom
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015)
Mr. Matthew R. Marsteller
(Past-Chair, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015)
Mrs. Kimberly Michele Bailey
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Andrea Baruzzi
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Margaret Helms Bean
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Roxanne Bogucka
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Roxanne Bogucka
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Jeffra Diane Bussmann
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Nancy J. Butkovich
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Cristina Marie Caminita
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015)
John Carey
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Larayne J. Dallas
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Kiyomi Diane Deards
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Shannon Farrell
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Bonnie L. Fong
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Dr. Moriana L. M. Garcia
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Edward L. F. Gonzalez
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Dr. Sara Gonzalez
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Kathleen M. Gregory
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Julie E. Griffin
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Karen Stanley Grigg
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Ms. Rachel Ellen Hamelers
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Eileen G. Harrington
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Barbara C. Harvey
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Jeanne Hoover
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Mr. Timothy W. Klassen
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Peter John Larsen
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Ms. Cindy Li
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Mr. Matthew R. Marsteller
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Dr. Greg Nelson
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Nestor L. Osorio
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Lori J. Ostapowicz-Critz
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Amy C. Prendergast
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Tammera M. Race
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Hannah Gascho Rempel
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Jennifer Roach
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
David Romito
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Mrs. Lutishoor Salisbury
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Maxine Schmidt
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Flora G. Shrode
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Mr. Wayne Strickland
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Mr. Andrew P. Stuart
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Elizabeth Ann Wallace
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Elizabeth Ann Wallace
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Ms. Annie Zeidman-Karpinski
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Li Zhang
(Member, July 1, 2014, to June 30, 2016)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2014. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.