Mr. Matthew R. Marsteller
(Chair, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2014)
Ms. Marianne Stowell Bracke
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2014)
Lori J. Ostapowicz-Critz
(Past-Chair, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2014)
Ricardo Andrade
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Mrs. Ariel M. Andrea
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Mrs. Kimberly Michele Bailey
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Andrea Baruzzi
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Elizabeth A. Berman
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Roxanne Bogucka
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Rachel Borchardt
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Donna M. Braquet
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2014)
Jeffra Diane Bussmann
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Nancy J. Butkovich
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Tim Byrne
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
John Carey
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Larayne J. Dallas
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Kiyomi Diane Deards
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Judith Z. Emde
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Shannon Farrell
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Bonnie L. Fong
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Edward L. F. Gonzalez
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Dr. Sara Gonzalez
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Julie E. Griffin
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Rachel Ellen Hamelers
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Barbara C. Harvey
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Dr. Will Hires
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Jeanne Hoover
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Margeaux Johnson
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Mr. Timothy W. Klassen
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Betty Landesman
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Peter John Larsen
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Mr. Edward F. Lener
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Jack Maness
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Sue A. McFadden
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2014)
Dr. Greg Nelson
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Nestor L. Osorio
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Lori J. Ostapowicz-Critz
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Amy L. Paster
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Ms. Amy C. Prendergast
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Fran Rosen
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Maxine Schmidt
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Maribeth Beth Slebodnik
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Mr. Wayne Strickland
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Mr. Andrew P. Stuart
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Kathy Szigeti
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Elizabeth Ann Wallace
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Ms. Kara Whatley
(Member, July 1, 2012, to June 30, 2014)
Ms. Annie Zeidman-Karpinski
(Member, July 1, 2013, to June 30, 2015)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2013. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.