April Hines
(Chair, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Mrs. Rachael Elrod, Ed.D.
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Tamara Rhodes
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Ericka Arvidson Raber
(Past-Chair, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Samantha Godbey
(Secretary, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Annie R. Armstrong
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Lisa D. Becksford
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Dawn Victoria Behrend
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Jodie Borgerding
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Jodie Borgerding
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Hui - Fen Chang
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Yu-Hui Chen
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Dr. Emily Swensen Darowski
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Katherine Safiah Donaldson
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Julia Eisenstein
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Robin L. Ewing
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Ms. Joyce Garczynski
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Stacy R. Gilbert
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 20, 2021)
Samantha Godbey
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2021)
Carin Graves
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Megan Blauvelt Heuer
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Ms. Sarah C. Johnson
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Rebecca Kelley
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Mr. Tylar Allan Kerstetter
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Ashlynn Kogut
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Ashlynn Kogut
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Mr. Stephen Maher
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Ms. Kimberly Miller
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Amy Minix
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Ms. Jill Erin Morningstar
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Nancy O'Brien
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Ericka Arvidson Raber
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2022)
Dr. Karen N. Reed
(Member, July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021)
Jordan Scott Sly
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Karna Younger
(Member, July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2021)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2020. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.