Ms. Joyce Garczynski
(Chair, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Jill Erin Morningstar
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Kaya Van Beynen
(Past-Chair, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Samantha Godbey
(Secretary, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Dorinne E. Banks
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Paul L. Belloni
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Jodie Borgerding
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Katherine Eileen Boss
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Callie Wiygul Branstiter
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Yu-Hui Chen
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Christina Cicchetti
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Mr. Scott Andrew Collard
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Stephanie Davis-Kahl
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mrs. Rachael Elrod, Ed.D.
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Sarah W. French
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Diane M. Fulkerson
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Dr. Deborah B. Gaspar
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Samantha Godbey
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2021)
Mrs. Mandy L. Havert
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Andrea Hebert
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
April Hines
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Dr. Alex R. Hodges
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Cassandra Kvenild
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Bernadette A. Lear
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Qunying Li
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Amanda Melilli
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Ms. Catherine Helen Michael
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Kimberly Miller
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Nancy P. O'Brien
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Regina Pauly
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Amber A. Prentiss
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. James W. Rosenzweig
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Heidi E.K. Senior
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Todd Shipman
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Dr. Elena M. Soltau
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 29, 2018)
Kaya Van Beynen
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Amanda L. W. Ziegler
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Dan P. Zuberbier
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2018)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2017. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.