Kaya Van Beynen
(Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Joyce Garczynski
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Bernadette A. Lear
(Past-Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Ericka Arvidson Raber
(Secretary, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Tiffany Anne Baglier
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Dorinne E. Banks
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Laura Bonella
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Jodie Borgerding
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Katherine Eileen Boss
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Yu-Hui Chen
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Christina Cicchetti
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Mr. Scott Andrew Collard
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Stephanie Davis-Kahl
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Damecia Donahue
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Mrs. Rachael Elrod, Ed.D.
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Katherine Farmer
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Sarah W. French
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Dr. Deborah B. Gaspar
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Dr. Deborah B. Gaspar
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Samantha Godbey
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
April Hines
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Dr. Alex R. Hodges
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Cassandra Kvenild
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Bernadette A. Lear
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Jill Erin Morningstar
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Nancy P. O'Brien
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Regina Pauly
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Kimberly Pendell
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Dana Scott Peterman
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ericka Arvidson Raber
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Mr. James W. Rosenzweig
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Heidi E.K. Senior
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Cheryl S. Smith
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Dr. Elena M. Soltau
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Faith Steele
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2016. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.