Mr. Andrew P. Stuart
(Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Kara Whatley
(Vice-Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Mary Linn Bergstrom
(Past-Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Mrs. Kimberly Michele Bailey
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Mary Linn Bergstrom
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Elizabeth A. Berman
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Rachel Besara
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Beth W. Blanton-Kent
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Rachel Borchardt
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Marianne Stowell Bracke
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Larayne J. Dallas
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Angela R. Davis
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Shannon Farrell
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Bonnie L. Fong
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Melissa Gold
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Julie E. Griffin
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Karen Stanley Grigg
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Dr. Nathan Frank Hall
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Rachel Ellen Hamelers
(Member-at-Large, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Eileen G. Harrington
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Barbara C. Harvey
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Patricia E. Kenly
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Peter John Larsen
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Peter John Larsen
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Mr. Edward F. Lener
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Michelle Leonard
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Cindy Li
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Mr. Matthew R. Marsteller
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Sue A. McFadden
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Mr. John J. Meier
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Dr. Greg Nelson
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Virginia Pannabecker
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Stephanie Jo Pierce
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Amy C. Prendergast
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Laksamee Anne Putnam
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Tammera M. Race
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Ms. Tammera M. Race
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Mr. Keir Reavie
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Hannah Gascho Rempel
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Hannah Gascho Rempel
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Fran Rosen
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Fran Rosen
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Mrs. Lutishoor Salisbury
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Sara Scheib
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
David J. Schmitt
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Mr. Wayne Strickland
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Ms. Ana Torres
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Cherie Turner
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Dr. Zoe Unno
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Elizabeth Ann Wallace
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Li Zhang
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Bonnie L. Fong
(Publicity, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2016. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.