Barbara M. MacAlpine
(Chair, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2008)
Mr. Steven M. Adams
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Damon L. Austin
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Sophie Bogdanski
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Ms. Marianne Stowell Bracke
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Ms. Jo Ann Calzonetti
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Daria O. Carle
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Marilyn C. Christianson
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Bryna R. Coonin
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Jeanne R. Davidson
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Linda L. Eells
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Julia M. Gelfand
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Nora Hillyer
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Elizabeth Spackman Hopkins
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2009)
S J
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Janice M. Jaguszewski
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Martin A. Kesselman
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2010)
Peter John Larsen
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Mr. Edward F. Lener
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Richard Dana Llewellyn
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Jin Ma
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Margaret Mellinger
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Ms. Kavita S. Mundle
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2008)
Nestor L. Osorio
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Lori J. Ostapowicz-Critz
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
George S. Porter
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Elizabeth A. Roberts
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2008)
David Romito
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Maxine Schmidt
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2008)
Julie Shen
(Member, July 1, 2006, to August 29, 2007)
William S. Simpson
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Ms. Maribeth Beth Slebodnik
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Catherine B. Soehner
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Irwin Weintraub
(Member, July 1, 2006, to June 30, 2008)
Ms. Kara Whatley
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2009)
Ms. Annie Zeidman-Karpinski
(Member, July 1, 2007, to June 30, 2010)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2007. Last retrieved on 09/21/2024. Refresh now.