Council Training & Engagement Committee
Charge
°ÄÃÅÁùºÏ²Ê¿ª½±app
To develop and carry out an ongoing training and engagement program for councilors.
Roster
Joseph M. Eagan
(Chair, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Tamika Barnes
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Roberto Carlos Delgadillo
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Renee Di Pilato
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Joseph M. Eagan
(Member, July 1, 2016, to June 30, 2018)
Patricia M. Hogan
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Sara Kelly Johns, Sara Kelly Johns
(Member, May 11, 2016, to June 30, 2017)
Amy Spence Lappin
(Member, July 1, 2015, to June 30, 2017)
Gina A. Persichini
(Board Liaison, July 1, 2016, to January 31, 2018)
Gina A. Persichini
( Executive Board Liaison, June 30, 2015, to July 1, 2016)
Lois Ann Gregory-Wood
(Staff Liaison, June 30, 2015, to July 1, 2018)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2016. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.
Composition
°ÄÃÅÁùºÏ²Ê¿ª½±app
Seven (7) Members, including Chair. It is advisable that members be current or former Councilors.