Council Training & Engagement Committee
Charge
°ÄÃÅÁùºÏ²Ê¿ª½±app
To develop and carry out an ongoing training and engagement program for councilors.
Roster
Dora T. Ho
(Chair, July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. Nick H. Buron
(Member, July 1, 2018, to June 30, 2020)
Roberto Carlos Delgadillo
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. Aaron W. Dobbs
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Mr. Jamie L. Mason
(Member, July 1, 2017, to June 30, 2019)
Toni Negro
(Member, June 30, 2018, to July 31, 2020)
Tamika Barnes
(Board Liaison, June 30, 2018, to July 31, 2019)
Ms. Diane R. Chen
( Executive Board Liaison, February 13, 2018, to July 2, 2018)
Lois Ann Gregory-Wood
(Staff Liaison, June 30, 2018, to December 28, 2018)
Lois Ann Gregory-Wood
(Staff Liaison, June 30, 2015, to July 1, 2018)
Displaying active committee roster as of 07/01/2018. Last retrieved on 09/20/2024. Refresh now.
Composition
°ÄÃÅÁùºÏ²Ê¿ª½±app
Seven (7) Members, including Chair. It is advisable that members be current or former Councilors.